U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00625
  • Case Name: Marez v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Petition for Removal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Standing Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Acceptance of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Attorney Action Required]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.