U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00633
  • Case Name: Energy Enhancement System, LLC et al v. Shurka et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Attorney Fees]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Clerks Notice Reassign Judge]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Remand to State Court]
  • April 10, 2025: [AO 121 Copyright Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Option to Decline MJ - FORM]
  • April 10, 2025: [General Orders regarding MJ assignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 10, 2025: [Petition Removal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.