U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kim
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joint Discovery Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment/Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.