U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ali Bess, Jr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Discovery Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum / ad Testificandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Grand Jury Return]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.