U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00640
  • Case Name: Quinata v. Silver State Schools Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice Corrected Image/Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Corrected Image/Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement in Removal Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate Interested Parties]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order Removal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Petition Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.