U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Tuominen v. Nevada Gold Mines, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.