U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00649
  • Case Name: Provstgaard v. Nye County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically]
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent for Electronic Service of Documents]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response Order to Show Cause]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Show Cause]
  • April 11, 2025: [Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proposed Summons to be issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.