U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Rueda-Denvers v. Breitenbach et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Change of Deputy Attorney General]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice Appearance of Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.