U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund v. ITZRoyalty Construction, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Entry of Clerks Default]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order for Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.