U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00662
  • Case Name: Willingham et al v. Pueblo Del Sol
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Complaint Amended]
  • April 23, 2025: [Objection Report and Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent for Electronic Service of Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Assign Judges in Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.