U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12202
  • Case Name: SABRINA LESHA DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Creditor Request for Notice (Batch) (Creditors)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 7 Individual (BNC)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHAPIRO, BRIAN D. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.