U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01452
  • Case Name: De Leon et al v. Robinson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.