U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Kelly-Harrison, Inc. v. CHDP Pahrump
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice Corrected Image/Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.