U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-12631-abl
  • Case Name: VELOCITY ESPORTS ORLANDO DOWNTOWN, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Resolution of Board of Directors]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Notice of Docketing Error (BNC) (BK)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Resolution of Board of Directors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Auto-docket of online payment]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Notice of Appearance (BK)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-11]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CHAPTER, 11 - LV [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.