U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-16626-
  • Case Name: Robert Bongiorno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Modifing Claims]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Certificate of Consent]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Expunge Claims/Reduce Claims/Modify Claims/Object To]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compensation]
July, 2022
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compensation]
April, 2022
  • April 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Discharging Debtor]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Certification of No Objection]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - multi]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Hrg Ntc Aplc for Compensation]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Cross Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compel]
  • January 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic)]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Determination of Adjournment Request]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic)]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Certification of No Objection]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Response ]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Cross Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Cross Motion]
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Compel]
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Order (Generic)]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Consent Order ]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Determination of Adjournment Request]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Order (Generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Determination of Adjournment Request]
November, 2018
  • November 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Retention ]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Determination of Adjournment Request]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Hearing Rescheduled (Document)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Opposition]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Relief from Stay (Fee)]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Hearing Rescheduled (Document)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Hearing Held]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Notice to File Financial Management]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Retention ]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Assets]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bezner, Karen E. [Meeting of Creditors - Add Judge all Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.