open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:19-25650-
    Party Name:Al Amjady
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Docketing Error]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held and Continued]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Rescheduled (Document)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice to File Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Withdrawn (Document)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing - (No Upload)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1050120
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =