open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:3:19-cv-20966
    Party Name:MCPHERSON v. CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order 60-Day Administrative Termination]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement (aty)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Trenton)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?422572
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =