open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:3:19-cv-18384
    Party Name:PASKESZ v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Confidentiality Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?417502
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =