U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10360-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAM REYNOSO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.