U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-02032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUCIANA MACHADO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.