U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZAVALA-ZAVALA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.