U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DESIR et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.