U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-08131-2
  • Case Name: USA v. ARCE, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.