U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-09083-8
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.