U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-02871
  • Case Name: STUDENT 1 et al v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2025: [QC - Generic Message]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.