open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00540
    Party Name:Hurst v. Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?420797
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =