open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00840
    Party Name:United States Fire Insurance Company v. Ceja et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend (other)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430398
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =