open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cr-02748-1
    Party Name:USA v. Grijalva
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Appointment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response (when not to a motion)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?428400
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =