U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01426-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fredrickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 10, 2023: [Release from Custody]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.