U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01711-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Burciaga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.