U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01950-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • May 13, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • May 13, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 11, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.