U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abeita, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.