U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00973-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • July 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Bond for Witness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.