U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00831-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.