U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00535
  • Case Name: Comer v. Mutual Telecom Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.