U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00613
  • Case Name: Wiggins v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.