U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00624
  • Case Name: Vega v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.