U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.