U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00638
  • Case Name: Kaplan et al v. PHC-Las Cruces, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Declaration]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.