U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00646
  • Case Name: Bender v. Allstate Indemnity Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • November 22, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.