U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00753
  • Case Name: Lozoya Rodriguez et al v. Mayorkas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.