U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00764
  • Case Name: Niederstadt v. Correctional Solutions Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appendix/Supplement]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.