U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00819
  • Case Name: Giere v. Nixon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.