U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00818
  • Case Name: Adriatic Insurance Company v. Zada et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Consolidate Cases]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.