U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00930
  • Case Name: Mathis v. New Mexico Children Youth & Families Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.