U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00933
  • Case Name: Parraz et al v. Board of Regents of UNM
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Remand]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.