U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Sellers v. Humana Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.