U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Second Presbyterian Church of Albuquerque, NM v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 15, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Vacate]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.