U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00963
  • Case Name: Murphy et al v. Taos County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.