U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01276
  • Case Name: Brooks v. Travino et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.